Tổng Bí Thư Nguyễn Phú Trọng và những mốc son trong cuộc đời làm cách mạng
Summary
TLDRComrade Nguyễn Phú Trọng, General Secretary of the Central Committee of the Communist Party of Vietnam, passed away on July 19, 2024, at the age of 80. Born in 1944, he held numerous high-ranking positions, including Chairman of the National Assembly and President of Vietnam. His career was marked by a deep commitment to the Party, education, and anti-corruption efforts, earning him prestigious awards and recognition for his exceptional contributions to the nation's revolutionary cause.
Takeaways
- 🕊️ Comrade Nguyen Phu Trong passed away at the age of 80 due to illness, despite dedicated medical care and family support.
- 📅 He was born on April 14, 1944, in Dong Hoi, Dong Anh, Hanoi, and joined the Communist Party of Vietnam on December 19, 1967.
- 🏛️ Holding a high level of political theory and expertise, he was a professor and doctor in political science, specializing in Party building.
- 📚 He served as General Secretary for three consecutive terms (11th, 12th, and 13th) and was a member of the Politburo for several terms.
- 🏢 He held various significant positions, including Chairman of the National Assembly and Chairman of the State of the Socialist Republic of Vietnam from 2018.
- 🎓 His early career included being an editor for the Communist Party magazine and a secretary for the Party committee.
- 📘 He was actively involved in the Party's theoretical and educational work, contributing to the Party's publications and development.
- 🏛️ He was elected as the President of Vietnam and continued to serve in various leadership roles within the Communist Party.
- 🏅 He was awarded the Golden Star Order and other prestigious medals for his outstanding contributions to the Party and the nation.
- 🔍 He was also involved in anti-corruption efforts, serving on the Central Steering Committee on Anti-Corruption and Negative Phenomena.
- 📝 His educational background included studying at the Nguyen Ai Quoc Advanced School (now the Ho Chi Minh National Academy of Politics) and obtaining a Ph.D. in Party Building from the Soviet Union.
Q & A
Who was the transcript about?
-The transcript is about Comrade Nguyen Phu Trong, the General Secretary of the Central Committee of the Communist Party of Vietnam.
When was Comrade Nguyen Phu Trong born?
-Comrade Nguyen Phu Trong was born on April 14, 1944.
What was his ethnicity and place of birth?
-He was of the Kinh ethnicity and was born in Dong Hoi commune, Dong Anh district, Hanoi city.
When did he join the Communist Party of Vietnam?
-He joined the Communist Party of Vietnam on December 19, 1967, with the official date being December 19, 1968.
What positions did he hold in the Communist Party of Vietnam?
-He held positions such as General Secretary for the 11th, 12th, and 13th tenures, a member of the Politburo for the 8th, 9th, 10th, 11th, 12th, and 13th tenures, and a permanent member of the Politburo from August 1999 to April 2001.
What was his educational background?
-He studied at the Nguyen Gia Thiep Gia Lam High School in Hanoi, then at the Faculty of Literature at Hanoi University, and later pursued postgraduate studies in political science, earning a Doctorate in Party Building at the Academy of Social Sciences in the Soviet Union.
When did he serve as the President of Vietnam?
-He served as the President of Vietnam from October 2018.
What were his contributions to the field of political science?
-He held a high-level theoretical and political degree, was a Professor and Doctor of Political Science, and specialized in Party Building.
What was his role in the fight against corruption?
-He was part of the Central Steering Committee on Anti-Corruption and was involved in efforts to combat negative phenomena and corruption.
What were some of the awards he received for his contributions?
-He was awarded the Golden Star Medal, the 55th Anniversary of the Party Emblem, and many other prestigious Vietnamese and international medals.
When did he pass away and at what age?
-He passed away on July 19, 2024, at the age of 80.
Outlines
😀 Life and Career of Nguyễn Phú Trọng
This paragraph provides a brief biography of Nguyễn Phú Trọng, the General Secretary of the Communist Party of Vietnam. Born on April 14, 1944, he passed away on July 19, 2024, at the age of 80. With a high level of political and professional expertise, he held various significant positions within the party and government, including General Secretary for three terms, a member of the Central Committee, and President of the Socialist Republic of Vietnam from 2018. His educational background includes a Ph.D. in political science and a career in academia and political journalism before entering the political sphere.
🏛 Political Contributions and Honors of Nguyễn Phú Trọng
The second paragraph outlines Nguyễn Phú Trọng's political career and contributions to the Communist Party of Vietnam and the nation. He was elected to the Central Committee and the Political Bureau and served as the Chairman of the National Assembly. He was also the Secretary of the Communist Party and the Central Military Commission. His tenure included efforts in anti-corruption and maintaining the integrity of the party. He received numerous honors and awards for his exceptional service, including the Golden Star Order and other prestigious national and international medals.
Mindmap
Keywords
💡Nguyễn Phú Trọng
💡General Secretary
💡Communist Party of Vietnam
💡Hội Đồng chuyên môn
💡Bí thư
💡Quốc hội
💡Tham nhũng
💡Đại hội đại biểu
💡Huân chương
💡Tiến sĩ
💡Chủ tịch nước
Highlights
Nguyễn Phú Trọng passed away on July 19, 2024, at the age of 80.
He was born on April 14, 1944, in Đông Anh, Hanoi.
He joined the Communist Party of Vietnam on December 19, 1967.
He held the position of General Secretary for the 11th, 12th, and 13th terms.
He was a member of the Politburo for the 8th, 9th, 10th, 11th, 12th, and 13th terms.
He served as the President of Vietnam from 2018.
He was the Chairman of the National Assembly for the 11th and 12th terms.
He was the Secretary of the Central Military Commission.
He was a delegate of the National Assembly for the 11th, 12th, 13th, 14th, and 15th terms.
He was a professor with a Ph.D. in political science.
He worked at the Communist Party Building Magazine from 1968 to 1973.
He was a member of the Central Committee of the Communist Party from 1994.
He was the Secretary of the Hanoi Party Committee for the 12th and 13th terms.
He was awarded the Golden Star Medal and other prestigious awards for his contributions.
He was re-elected as General Secretary of the Central Committee of the Communist Party of Vietnam in 2021.
He was also the Secretary of the Central Military Commission and a member of the Central Public Security Party Committee.
He was involved in the Central Steering Committee on Anti-Corruption.
Transcripts
tóm tắc tiểu sử đồng chí Nguyễn Phú
Trọng tổng bí thư ban chấp hành Trung
ương Đảng cộng sản Việt Nam theo thông
tin từ Hội Đồng chuyên môn bảo vệ sức
khỏe cán bộ trung ương đồng chí Tổng bí
thư Nguyễn Phú Trọng sau thời gian dài
Lâm bệnh Mặc dù được Đảng Nhà nước tập
thể các giáo sư bác sĩ tận tình cứu chữa
gia đình hết lòng chăm sóc nhưng do tuổi
cao bệnh nặng đồng chí đã từ trần vào
lúc
13:38 ngày 19 tháng 7 năm 2024 tại bệnh
viện trung ương Quân độ 108 hưởng thọ 80
tuổi đồng chí Tổng bí thư Nguyễn Phú
Trọng Sinh ngày 14 tháng 4 năm
1944 quê quán tại xã Đông Hội huyện Đông
Anh thành phố Hà Nội trình độ lý luận
chính trị cao cấp trình độ chuyên môn
Giáo sư Tiến sĩ chính trị học chuyên
ngành xây dựng Đảng cưng nhân ngữ vă
Ngày vào Đảng 19 tháng 12 năm
1967 ngày chính thức là 19 tháng 12 năm
1968 dân tộc Kinh Các vụ đảm nhiệm Tổng
Bí thư khóa 11 12 13 Ủy viên Bộ chính
trị khóa 8 9 10 11 12 13 thường trực Bộ
Chính Trị từ tháng 8 năm 1999 đến tháng
4 năm 2001 Ủy viên Trung ương Đảng khóa
7 từ tháng 01 năm
1994 khóa 8 khóa 9 khóa 10 khóa 11 12 1
Chủ tịch nước Cộng hòa xã hội chủ nghĩ
Việt Nam từ tháng 10 năm 2018
Chủ tịch Quốc hội Khóa 1112 Bí thư Quân
ĩ Trung ương trưởng ban chỉ đạo Trung
ương về phòng chống tham nhũng đại biểu
quốc hội khóa 11 12 13 14 15 tóm tác quá
trình công tác năm 1957 đến năm 1963 học
trường phổ thông cấp 2 cấp 3 Nguyễn Gia
Thiều Gia Lâm Hà Nội năm 1963 đến năm
1967 sinh viên khoa Ngữ Văn trường Đại
học Tổng hợp Hà Nội tháng 12 năm 1967
đến tháng 7 năm 1968 làm việc tại phòng
tư liệu tạp chí học tập nay là Tạp chí
Cộng sản từ tháng 8 năm
1968 đến tháng 8 năm
1973 cán bộ Biên tập ban xây dựng Đảng
Tạp chí Cộng Sản đi thực tế ở huyện
Thanh Oai tỉnh Hà Tây nay là Hà Nội năm
1971 bí thư chi đoàn cơ quan Tạp chí
Cộng sản từ năm 1969 đến năm
1973 từ t tháng 9 năm 1973 đến tháng 4
năm
1976 nghiên cứu sinh khoa học kinh tế
chính trị tại trường Đảng cao cấp Nguyễn
Ái Quốc nay là Học viện Chính trị quốc
gia Hồ Chí Minh Chi ủy viên từ tháng 0
năm
1976 đến tháng 8 năm 1980 cán bộ Biên
tập ban xây dựng Đảng tập chí Cộng sản
phó bí thư chi bộ từ tháng 9 năm 1980
đến tháng 8 năm 1981 học Nga Văn tại
trường Đảng cao cấp nguyện Ái Quốc nay
là Học viện Chính trị quốc gia Hồ Chí
Minh tháng 9 năm 1981 đến tháng 7 năm
1983 thực tạp sinh và bảo vệ luận án phó
tiến sĩ này là tiến sĩ khoa Xây dựng
Đảng thuộc viện Hàng Lam Khoa Học Xã Hội
Liên
Xô tháng 8 năm 1983 đến tháng 2 năm 1989
phó ban xây dựng Đảng tháng 10 năm 1983
trưởng ban xây dựng Đảng Tạp chí Cộng
Sản tháng 9 năm 1987 phó bí thư Đảng ủy
tháng B năm 1985 đến tháng 12 năm
1988 Rồi bí thư đã ngủy cơ quan Tạp chí
Cộng sản từ tháng 12 năm 1988 đến tháng
12 năm
1991 từ tháng 3 năm 1989 đến tháng 4 năm
1990 ủy viên ban Biên tập Tạp chí Cộng
Sản tháng 5 năm 1990 đến tháng 7 năm
1971 Phó Tổng Biên tập Tạp chí Cộng Sản
tháng 8 năm 1991 đến tháng 8 năm 1996
tổng biên tộc Tạp chí Cộng Sản tháng 0
năm
1994 tại Hội nghị đại biểu toàn quốc giữ
chìm kỳ của Đảng khóa 7 đồng chí được
bầu bố sung vào ban chấp hành Trung ương
Đảng tháng 6 năm 1996 tại Đại hội Đại
biểu toàn quốc lần thứ tá của đảng đồng
chí được bầu lại vào ban chấp hành Trung
ương Đảng tháng 8 năm 1996 đến tháng 2
năm
1998 Phó Bí thư Thành ủy Hà Nội kim
trưởng ban cán sự đệ học và trực tiếp
phụ trách ban Tuyên giáo thành ủy Hà Nội
tháng 12 năm 1997 tại Hội nghị lần thứ
tư ban chấp hành Trung ương Đảng khóa 8
đồng chí được bầu bổ sung vào bộ chính
trị khóa 8 tháng 2 năm 1998 đến tháng 01
năm 2000 phủ trách công tác tư tưởng văn
hóa và khoa giáo của Đảng tháng 8 năm
1999 đến tháng 0 năm 2001 tham gia
thường trực bộ chính trị tháng 3 năm
1998 đến tháng 8 năm 2006 Phó chủ tịch
hội đồng lý luận trung ương tháng 3 năm
1998 đến tháng 11 năm 2001 Chủ tịch Hội
đồng lý luận trung ương đảng phụ trách
công tác lý luận của Đảng tháng 11 năm
2021 đến tháng 8 năm
2006 từ tháng 01 năm 2000 Bí thư Thành
ủy Hà Nội khóa 12 tháng 12 năm 2000 tại
Đại hội đại biểu Đảng bộ thành phố Hà
Nội lần thứ 13 đồng chí được bầu giữ
chức Bí thư Thành ủy khóa 13 tháng 0 năm
2001 tại Đại hội Đại biểu toàn quốc lần
thứ chín của đảng đồng chí được bào lại
vào ban chấp hành trung ương Đảng được
Trung ương tiếp tục bầu vào bộ chính trị
từ tháng 0 năm 2002 cho đến nay được bầu
làm đại biểu quốc hội các khóa 11 12 13
14 tháng 12 năm 2005 tại Đại hội đại
biểu Đảng bộ thành phố Hà Nội lần thứ 14
đồng chí được bầu lại giữ chước Bí thư
Thành ủy khóa 14 đến tháng 6 năm 2006
tháng tư năm 2006 tại Đại hội Đại biểu
toàn quốc lần thứ 10 của đảng đồng chí
được bầu lại vào ban chấp hành trung
ương Đảng được Trung ương tiếp tục Bàu
vào bộ chính trị từ tháng 6 năm 2006 đến
tháng 7 năm 2011 chủ tịch quốc hội khóa
11 122 bí thư đảng đoàn Quốc hội Ủy viên
hội đồng quốc phòng và an ninh vào tháng
01 năm 2011 tại Đại hội Đại biểu toàn
quốc lần thứ 11 của đảng đồng chí được
bầu lại là Ủy viên Trung ương Đảng ủy
viên bộ chính trị và được bào giữ chức
Tổng Bí thư Ban Chấp hành Trung ương
Đảng Bí thư Quân ủy Trung ương từ tháng
2 năm 2013 cho đến nay trưng ban chỉ đạo
Trung ương về phòng chống tham nhũng vào
tháng 0 năm 2016 tại Đại hội Đại biểu
toàn quốc lần thứ 12 của Đảng đồng chí
được bầu lại là Ủy viên Trung ương Đảng
ủy viên bộ chính trị và tiếp tục được
bầu giữ chức Tổng Bí thư Ban Chấp hành
Trung ương Đảng Bí thư Quân ủy Trung
ương tháng 8 năm 2016 tham gia thường vụ
đảng ủy công an trung ương nh K 2015
2020 ngày 23 tháng 10 năm 2018 tại kỳ
họp thứ Sáu Quốc hội khóa 14 đồng chí
được bầu giữ chức Chủ tịch nước Cộng hòa
Xã hội Chủ nghĩa Việt Nam Nhiệm kỳ
2016-2021 ngày 30 tháng 01 năm 2021 tại
Đại hội Đại biểu toàn quốc lần thứ 13
của đảng đồng chí tiếp tục được bầu là
Ủy viên Trung ương Đảng khóa 13 nhiệm kỳ
2021-2026 ngày 31 tháng 1 năm 2021 tại
Hội nghị lần thứ nhất ban chấp hành
trung ươ đảng khóa 13 đồng chí ngyễn Phú
Trọng được tín nhiệm bầu giữ chức Tổng
Bí thư Ban Chấp hành Trung ương Đảng
cộng sản khóa 13 ngày 3 tháng 4 năm 2021
cho đến nay tổng bí thư ban chấp hành
Trung ương Đảng cộng sản Việt Nam Bí thư
Quân ủy Trung ương ủy viên ban thường vụ
đảng ủy công an trung ương trưởng ban
chỉ đạo Trung ương về phòng chống tham
nhũng tiêu cực do có nhiều công lao và
thành tích đặc biệt xuất sắc đối với sự
nghiệp cách mạng của Đảng và dân tộc đng
ch được Đảng và Nhà nước tặng thưởng
Huân chương sao vàng huy hiệu 55 năm
tuổi Đảng và nhiều huân huy chương cao
quý khác của Việt Nam và quốc tế
تصفح المزيد من مقاطع الفيديو ذات الصلة
Những chiến dịch ĐỐT LÒ tiêu biểu của Tổng Bí thư Nguyễn Phú Trọng | Hải Stark | Thế giới
Biografi Singkat Soeharto, Presiden kedua Republik Indonesia
Nelson Mandela Biography: Life and Accomplishments of a South African Leader
Biografi Ki Hajar Dewantara ✅ - Perjuangan Bapak Pendidikan Indonesia untuk Kemerdekaan Indonesia
M Baedowy, mengubah hidup dari memulung sampah
Philip Simmons
5.0 / 5 (0 votes)