Algérie, liste des présidents et chefs d'État Algeriens
Summary
TLDRThis video script outlines the history of Algerian presidents from the Provisional Government period (1958-1962) to the present day. It details the roles and contributions of key figures like Benyoucef Benkhedda, Houari Boumedienne, and Abdelaziz Bouteflika. The script also covers transitional periods, including the 1992 power vacuum and the roles of Mohamed Boudiaf and Ali Kafi. It provides insights into the political landscape of Algeria and the evolution of its leadership.
Takeaways
- 😀 The script provides a historical overview of the presidents of the Algerian Democratic and Popular Republic.
- 🏛 The first period described is the Provisional Government of the Algerian Republic from 1958 to 1962.
- 📜 The founder of the Algerian Democratic Manifesto and the UDMA, who later joined the National Liberation Front (FLN) during the war of independence, became the first head of state of the new republic.
- 💊 Benyoucef Benkhedda, a pharmacist and politician, was the second president of the Provisional Government and an early member of the MTLD.
- 🏛 The script mentions the period of the Algerian State in 1962, with Abdelhamid Ferras as a key political figure during this time.
- 🕋 The third period discussed is the Democratic and Popular Republic of Algeria since 1962, with several presidents highlighted, including Ferhat Abbas and Houari Boumediene.
- 🎖 Houari Boumediene, a military career officer, became the second head of state and president from 1965 to 1976, and then president of the republic from 1976 to 1978.
- 🕊 The script notes the brief interim presidency of Rabah Bitat following the death of Boumediene in 1978.
- 📖 Chadli Bendjedid, a colonel, writer, and statesman, served as the third president of Algeria from 1979 to 1992.
- 🗓 The script describes a period of power vacuum in Algeria on January 11, 1992, following the resignation of Chadli Bendjedid and the dissolution of the National Assembly.
- 🛑 Mohammed Boudiaf, a statesman and one of the founders of the FLN, led Algeria from January 16, 1992, until his assassination on June 29, 1992.
- 🏆 Ali Kafi, a career military officer and statesman, served as the second President of the High State Committee, a transitional governance body, from July 2, 1992, to January 30, 1994.
- 🌟 Liamine Zeroual, a general and statesman, led Algeria from 1994 to 1999, becoming the fourth president of the Democratic and Popular Republic of Algeria after winning the 1995 presidential election.
- 🏆 Abdelaziz Bouteflika, born in 1937, has been the fifth president of the Democratic and Popular Republic of Algeria since April 27, 1999, and holds the record for the longest tenure in office.
Q & A
Who was the founder of the Algerian Democratic and Popular Republic?
-The founder of the Algerian Democratic and Popular Republic was Ahmed Ben Bella, who was also a nationalist leader and the founder of the Algerian National Movement (UDMA).
What was the role of Benyoucef Benkhedda during the Algerian War of Independence?
-Benyoucef Benkhedda was the second President of the Provisional Government of the Algerian Republic (PRA) during the Algerian War of Independence, and he was also a pharmacist by training and a former militant of the Algerian People's Party (MTLD).
Who was the first President of Algeria after the independence?
-Ahmed Ben Bella became the first President of Algeria after the country's independence, serving from 1963 to 1965.
What significant event did Houari Boumediene lead in 1965?
-Houari Boumediene led a revolutionary coup on June 19, 1965, which resulted in him becoming the President of the Council of the Revolution and later the President of the Republic from 1976 until his death in 1978.
What was the role of Rabah Bitat during Houari Boumediene's presidency?
-Rabah Bitat served as the interim President of the Republic for 45 days in 1978 following the death of Houari Boumediene.
Who was the third President of Algeria and what were his contributions?
-Chadli Bendjedid was the third President of Algeria, serving from 1979 to 1992. He was a career military officer and a member of the June 1965 Revolution Council, and he also served as the Minister of Defense from 1979 to 1990.
What was the significance of the period of power vacuum in Algeria on January 11, 1992?
-The period of power vacuum on January 11, 1992, occurred after President Chadli Bendjedid's resignation and the dissolution of the National Assembly. This led to the creation of the High Security Council and the High State Committee to manage the state during the transitional period.
Who was assassinated during the political crisis in Algeria in 1992?
-Mohamed Boudiaf, who was leading Algeria as the President of the High State Committee during the political crisis, was assassinated on June 29, 1992.
Who succeeded Mohamed Boudiaf as the leader of Algeria during the transitional period?
-Ali Kafi succeeded Mohamed Boudiaf as the leader of Algeria, serving as the President of the High State Committee from July 2, 1992, to January 30, 1994.
Who is the current President of Algeria and when did he take office?
-Abdelaziz Bouteflika is the current President of Algeria, having taken office on April 27, 1999. He has been re-elected multiple times and holds the record for the longest tenure in the position.
What is the significance of the FLN in the political history of Algeria?
-The National Liberation Front (FLN) is a significant political party in Algeria's history. It played a crucial role in the Algerian War of Independence and has been the ruling party since independence. Many of Algeria's presidents, including Abdelaziz Bouteflika, have been members of the FLN.
Outlines
🏛 Founding Leaders and Early Governance of Algeria
This paragraph outlines the early period of the Algerian government, from the provisional government of the Algerian Republic from 1958 to 1962. It discusses the role of Ahmed Ben Bella as a nationalist leader and the founder of the UDMA, who became the first head of state after independence. The paragraph also mentions the second president, Benyoucef Benkhedda, a politician and pharmacist who was an MTLD militant and played a significant role during the Algerian War of Independence.
🕋 Post-Independence Political Shifts and Leadership
The second paragraph delves into the post-independence era of Algeria, highlighting the leadership of Abderrahmane Fares and his contributions to the Algerian political landscape. It also covers the tenure of Hamid Ben Bella, a key figure in the Algerian independence movement, who served as the first president of the People's National Assembly and later as the first president of the Republic. The paragraph concludes with the rise of Mohamed Benbrahim Boukharouba, known as Houari Boumediene, who became the second president of the Republic and held various high-ranking positions in the Algerian government and military.
📜 The Evolution of Algerian Presidency and Political Milestones
This paragraph discusses the evolution of the Algerian presidency since the establishment of the Democratic and Popular Republic of Algeria in 1962. It mentions the presidency of Abbasid Ben Abdallah, who was elected as the head of the Constituent Assembly, and his forced resignation by Ahmed Ben Bella. The paragraph also covers the leadership of Chadli Bendjedid, a career colonel and writer, who served as the third president of Algeria from 1979 to 1992, and his involvement in the National Liberation Front during his presidency.
🛑 Periods of Power Vacancy and Crisis Management
The fourth paragraph describes the periods of power vacancy in Algeria, starting with the resignation of Chadli Bendjedid in 1992 and the subsequent dissolution of the National People's Assembly. It highlights the establishment of the High Security Council and the High State Committee to manage the state during the power vacuum. The paragraph also recounts the assassination of Mohamed Boudiaf, a founder of the National Liberation Front and a key figure in the Algerian War of Independence, who was leading the country during the crisis as the president of the High State Committee.
🕊️ Transition to Modern Algerian Leadership
The final paragraph introduces Ali Kafi, a career military officer and the second president of the High State Committee, who led Algeria from July 1992 to January 1994. It also discusses Liamine Zeroual, a general and statesman who became the fourth president of the Democratic and Popular Republic of Algeria from 1994 to 1999. The paragraph concludes with the current president, Abdelaziz Bouteflika, who has been in office since April 27, 1999, and his significant contributions to Algeria's political and military history.
📢 Closing Remarks and Invitation for Engagement
The concluding paragraph serves as a closing remark for the video script, inviting viewers to share their comments and questions, and reminding them to subscribe to the channel for more content.
Mindmap
Keywords
💡Presidents of the Republic
💡Provisional Government
💡National Liberation Front (FLN)
💡Independence
💡Houari Boumediene
💡Non-Aligned Movement
💡Chadli Bendjedid
💡Political Crisis
💡Mouloud Hamrouche
💡Abdelaziz Bouteflika
💡Election
Highlights
The Algerian provisional government period from 1958 to 1962 and its first president, Ahmed Ben Bella.
Ahmed Ben Bella's role as a nationalist leader and founder of the Algerian Democratic Manifesto (UDMA), and his involvement with the National Liberation Front (FLN) during the war for independence.
Benyoucef Benkhedda's tenure as the second president of the Algerian provisional government and his background as a politician and pharmacist.
Abderrahmane Fares' political career, including his membership in the 1st French National Assembly and presidency of the Algerian Assembly.
Serra Abbas' election as the first president of the Algerian Democratic and Popular Republic after independence, and his forced resignation by Ahmed Ben Bella.
Hamide Ben Bella's role in the independence struggle, his presidency from 1963 to 1965, and his deposition by Houari Boumediene.
Houari Boumediene's rise to power through a coup, his tenure as the second president of Algeria, and his role in the Non-Aligned Movement.
Monsieur Rabah Bitat's interim presidency following Boumediene's death and his contributions to the National Liberation Front (FLN).
Chadli Bendjedid's presidency from 1979 to 1992, his military background, and his role as Minister of Defense.
The period of power vacuum in Algeria following Chadli Bendjedid's resignation and the establishment of the High Security Council.
Mouloud Hamrouche's brief presidency and his assassination, marking a period of political instability in Algeria.
Ali Kafi's leadership as the second president of the High State Committee and his military and diplomatic career.
Liamine Zeroual's rise to power, his election as president in 1995, and his role in the military and as Minister of Defense.
Abdelaziz Bouteflika's long-term presidency since 1999, his military and political career, and his election victories.
Bouteflika's re-election for a fourth term in 2014 with a significant majority of votes.
The video's call for viewer engagement through comments and subscription to the channel for more content.
Transcripts
[Musique]
liste des présidents de la république
algérienne démocratique et populaire
premièrement période de gouvernement
provisoire de la république algérienne
1958 à 1962
[Musique]
le président vers la base ni le 24 août
1899 à bois trône dans l'actuelle
commune doit déjà la wilaya de jijel est
mort le 24 décembre 1985 à alger est un
chef nationaliste et homme d'état
algérien fondateur de l'union
démocratique du manifeste algérien udma
rallier au front de libération nationale
fln durant la guerre d'indépendance
président du gouvernement provisoire de
la république algérienne ou pra de 1958
à 1961 il était le président de
l'assemblée nationale constituante après
l'indépendance devenant ainsi le premier
chef de l'état de la république
algérienne
[Musique]
1
alors
le président benyoucef benkhedda unis le
23 février 1920 à berrouaghia est mort
le 4 février 2003 à alger est un homme
politique algérien pharmacien de
formation ancien militant du mtld issu
le deuxième président du gouvernement
provisoire de la république algérienne
prat durant la guerre d'algérie et
jusqu'à l'indépendance du pays en 1962
[Musique]
mais
[Musique]
[Musique]
deuxièmement
période de l'état algérien en 1962 le
président dans cette période c'était
monsieur abderrahmane farès en cabine né
le 30 janvier 1911 à mal auprès d'app
nous est mort le 13 mai 1991 à zemmouri
était un homme politique algérien il est
membre de la 1ère assemblée nationale
constituante française alger en 1946
puis président de l'assemblée algérienne
en 1953 idiot à modérée du nationalisme
algérien
il signe le 26 septembre 1955 le
manifeste des 61
il se rallie en 1956 au spvm dont il
devient le trésorier et sert
d'intermédiaire entre les instances de
la révolution et le gouvernement
français jusqu'à son arrestation en 1961
pour atteinte à la sûreté de l'état
il devient d'avril à septembre 1962 en
application des accords d'evian
président de l'exécutif provisoire
chargé de la gestion courante du pays et
de la préparation du référendum d'auto
détermination de l'algérie devant
décider de l'avenir du pays et mettre
fin à la guerre en cours
non
m
[Musique]
troisièmement période de la république
algérienne démocratique et populaire
depuis 1962 le président de la
république algérienne démocratique et
populaire
serra abbas d'as du mandat mandat
électoral 25 septembre 1962 thierry 15
septembre 1963
élu président de l'assemblée nationale
constituante le 20 septembre 1962
gouvernement de benbella un parti
politique et sélène note faits marquants
premier chef d'état de la république
algérienne démocratique et populaire
après son élection à la tête de
l'assemblée constituante
il est forcé à la démission et mis en
résidence surveillée à adrar par ahmed
ben bella
[Musique]
m
[Musique]
le président hamid ben bella né le 25
décembre 1916 à magna près de tlemcen en
oranie au nord-ouest de l'algérie alors
colonie française est mort le 11 avril
2011 à alger est un combattant de
l'indépendance algérienne est un homme
d'état algérien il est président du
conseil des ministres de 1962 à 1963
puis le premier président de la
république de 1963 à 1965
monsieur mandela est un des mains chef
historique du comité révolutionnaire
d'unité d'action crua à l'origine du
front de libération nationale fln
partiel indépendantistes algériens
il est arrêté pendant la guerre
d'algérie n'est prend part à
l'indépendance du pays
à la tête du fln et devient le premier
président de la république algérienne le
15 septembre 1963 poste qu'il cumule
avec celui de premier ministre
il occupe cette dernière fonction depuis
le 27 septembre 1962 il est destitué par
le coup d'état du 19 juin 1965 mené par
son vice premier ministre le nail houari
boumédiène
[Musique]
le président mohamed benbrahim
boukharouba dit houari boumédiène né le
23 août 1932 à une enseigne a situé près
de guelmin est mort le 27 décembre 1970
à l'âge de 46 ans à alger est un colonel
et un homme d'état algérien il est le
deuxième chef de l'état de 1965 à 1976
puis deuxième président de la république
de 1976 à 1978
militaire de carrière chef de
l'état-major général de l'armée de
libération nationale de 1959 à 1962
ils occupent de hautes fonctions d'état
tels que nos ministres de la défense
souvent bénin en septembre 1962 poste
qu'il cumule avec celui de vice-premier
ministre durant la présidence d'annick
bendella de mai 1963 juin 1965 à la
suite d'un coup d'état
vérifiez de réajustement révolutionnaire
houari boumédiène devient en date du 20
juin 1965 président du conseil de la
révolution et jusqu'au 10 décembre 1976
date à laquelle il était le président de
la république jusqu'à son décès le 25
décembre 1978 tout en gardant son
portefeuille de ministre de la défense
c'est ainsi que boumédiène cumule cette
fonction avec celle de premier ministre
du 20 juin 1965 à sa mort il a été
président du front de libération
nationale dès le coup d'état et durant
son mandat à la présidence de la
république il suce secrétaire général du
mouvement des non-alignés de septembre
1973 à août 1976 en son honneur
l'aéroport d'alger portait son nom
aéroports d'alger houari boumédiène
ainsi que sa commune de naissance
[Musique]
le président monsieur rabah bitat né le
19 décembre 1925 à aïn kerma actuelle
messaoud boudjeriou wilaya de
constantine est mort le 10 avril 2000 à
paris est un militant nationaliste et
homme politique algérien un des
fondateurs du front de libération
nationale en 1954 et après
l'indépendance
plusieurs fois ministre il a aussi été
président de la république par intérim
durant 45 jours en 1978 à la suite du
décès de houari boumédiène
[Musique]
le président de la république algérienne
démocratique et populaire
chadli bendjedid souvent appelée
simplement par son prénom chadli chadli
barges a dit né le 1er juillet 1929 à
sebha dans la commune de bouteldja
wilaya d'el tarf dans le nord-est de
l'algérie alors colonie française est
mort le 6 octobre 2011 à l'hôpital
militaire hay nadja d'alger est un
colonel
écrivain et homme d'état algérien il est
le troisième président de l'algérie de
1979 à 1992 méritèrent de carrière
membre du conseil de la révolution de
juin 1965 à décembre 1976 son accession
à la magistrature suprême est décidée
par le conclave du parti unique
ainsi ici les troisièmes président de la
république algérienne démocratique et
populaire du 9 février 1979 jusqu'à sa
démission le 11 janvier 1992 il fut
aussi ministre de la défense du 8 mai
1979 au 25 juillet 1990 de plus il a été
président du front de libération
nationale durant son mandat à la
présidence de la république président de
1979 à 1992 il meurt le 6 octobre 2011 à
alger des suites d'un cancer à l'âge de
83 ans
[Musique]
[Musique]
période de vacance du pouvoir le 11
janvier 1992 pierre et 7 janvier 1992
ghozali 2 à la suite de la démission de
chadli bendjedid le 11 janvier 1992 et
de la signature par lui du décret
portant dissolution de l'assemblée
nationale le 4 janvier 1992 l'algérie se
trouve en situation de vacance du
pouvoir
le conseil constitutionnel qui a reçu la
lettre de démission
le journal constate la vacance
définitive de la présidence de la
république
mais le président du conseil ne peut
assumer la charge de chef de l'état
comme le prévoit l'article 84 de la
constitution de 1989
car celle ci n'a pas prévu dans ses
dispositions le cas de conjonction de
vacances de l'assemblée populaire
nationale par dissolution et de la
présidence de la république par des
missions mais en cas de décès seulement
l'algérie sortait d'un processus
électoral législatif non validées à
l'origine des troubles dans le pays qui
a abouti à la démission du président
chadli en l'absence d'un président de
l'assemblée populaire nationale est dans
une situation non prévue par la
constitution
personne peut assumer le rôle de chef de
l'état le haut conseil de sécurité se
réunira 12 au 14 janvier pour décider de
la création du haut comité d'état chargé
d'exercer l'ensemble des pouvoirs
confiés par la constitution en vigueur
au président de la république
[Musique]
le président nos amis que vous dias ni
âme s'il a le 23 juin 1919 et assassiné
le 29 juin 1992 à annaba est un homme
d'état algérien il dirige algérie du 16
janvier 1992 au 29 juin 1992
fonctionnaires de profession membre
fondateur du front de libération
nationale fln
un des chefs de la guerre d'indépendance
algérienne est membre du gouvernement
provisoire de la république algérienne
oprah au poste de ministre d'état de
1958 à 1961 puis vice président jusqu'en
1962 il entre en opposition contre les
premiers régime mis en place à
l'indépendance de santé nih et s'exile
durant près de 28 ans au maroc
rappelé en algérie en 1992 en pleine
crise politique à la tête de l'état en
tant que président du haut comité d'état
organe en charge provisoire de la
gestion de l'état du 16 janvier 1992
jusqu'à son assassinat lors d'une
conférence des cadres à annaba les 29
juin 1992
[Musique]
[Musique]
vacance du pouvoir 29 juin 1992 qui ré
de juillet 1992
vos amis 3
[Musique]
2
le président ali sakkaki ou à likasi né
le 7 octobre 1928 haye larouche en
algérie est mort le 16 avril 2013 à
genève en suisse est un colonel et homme
d'état algérien il dirige l'algérie du 2
juillet 1992 au 30 janvier 1994
militaire de carrière militants du fln
durant la guerre d'algérie il exerce
comme ambassadeur d'algérie dans
plusieurs pays
après l'indépendance il succède à
mohamed boudia en devenant du 2 juillet
1992 au 30 janvier 1994 le second
président du haut comité d'état organe
transitoire de la gestion de l'état il
succède à mohamed boudiaf comme
président du hce en 1994 élu président
du haut comité d'état parmi les membres
[Musique]
et
le président liamine zeroual né le 3
juillet 1941 abattements en algérie est
un général et un homme d'état algérien
il dirige algérie de 1994 à 1999
élevé au rang de général en 1990 il est
promu à la tête des forces terrestres de
son pays en 1989 et devient ministre de
la défense en 1993 dans le haut comité
d'état
il conserve ce poste jusqu'en 1994
nommé en période de crise chef de l'état
le 30 janvier 1994 il remporte
l'élection présidentielle de 1995
avec 60 yens 1,34 % des voix et devient
du 16 novembre 1995 au 27 avril 1999 le
quatrième président de la république
algérienne démocratique et populaire
[Musique]
le président abdelaziz bouteflika
prononciation du titre dans sa version
originale écouter né le 2 mars 1937 à
oujda est un homme d'état algérien y est
le cinquième président de la république
algérienne démocratique et populaire
depuis le 27 avril 1999 il détient
actuellement le record de longévité à la
tête du pays engagé à 19 ans dans
l'armée de libération nationale aln
pendant la guerre d'algérie il se lie
avec houari boumédiène sous l'égide
duquel il progresse rapidement dans
l'appareil administratif de harnais des
frontières élu député de tlemcen en 1962
il réélu en 1964 il est ministre de la
jeunesse des sports et du tourisme dans
le premier gouvernement de hamid ben
bella de septembre 1962 à septembre 1963
il occupe ensuite chez fonctions de
ministre des affaires étrangères de
septembre 1963 à mars 1979 dans les
trois gouvernements annick bendella et
les quatre gouvernements houari
boumédiène ainsi il exerce la fonction
de président de l'assemblée générale des
nations unies en 1974 par la suite il
devient ministre conseiller du président
de la république de mars 1979 à juillet
1980 dans le gouvernement abdel gagne un
candidat indépendant abdelaziz
bouteflika remporte l'élection
présidentielle de 1999 avec 73,8 % des
suffrages et devient le cinquième
président de la république algérienne
démocratique et populaire le 27 avril
1999 ministre de la défense 5 mai 2003
il est réélu dès le premier tour lors
des élections présidentielles de 2004
avec 85 % des voix et dès 2009 avec 80
10,2 pour cent lors de cette dernière il
est le candidat du front de libération
nationale fln
dont il est le président d'honneur
depuis le 28 janvier 2005 lors de
l'élection présidentielle de 2014
il est réélu pour un quatrième mandat
avec 90 à 8 5% des suffrages exprimés
[Musique]
merci d'avoir regardé cette vidéo et
j'attends vos commentaires positifs
si vous avez des questions n'hésitez pas
à nous contacter n'oubliez pas de vous
inscrire dans mon canal
[Musique]
oui
[Musique]
Weitere ähnliche Videos ansehen
Al-Adab A-Arabi Al-Muashir (Kesusastraan Arab Modern)
Tebboune au G7 : est-ce vraiment un exploit ? Non, l’Algérie est une habituée des sommets du G7
Political Parties: Crash Course Government and Politics #40
Periodisasi Pemberlakuan UUD di Indonesia
(PART 1) CHAPTER 3: WESTERN ART HISTORY
Days That Shook The World: Russia's Two Revolutions of 1917
5.0 / 5 (0 votes)